judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-89-09760-CV
06-89-09760-CV
07/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Harris County Hospital District
La Porte State Bank and Citizens Bank and Trust Company
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/2000Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/04/1990Mandate issued
01/16/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/03/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/19/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
12/19/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/14/1989Submitted
11/14/1989Submission
10/05/1989Submission
07/11/1989
07/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/13/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedOrdered carried with the case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/04/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Civil Court at Law No. 2
Harris
Honorable Tom Sullivan
503,579