judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-89-09756-CV
06-89-09756-CV
07/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Northwest Otolaryngology Associates, Et Al
Mobilease, Inc.
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/2000Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/18/1990Mandate Issued
06/18/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
05/02/1990Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/09/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
03/21/1990Writ Filed
02/21/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/06/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/23/1990Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
12/20/1989Reply Brief Filed
11/28/1989Party requested to filed reply
11/14/1989Submitted
11/14/1989Submission
10/19/1989Request for Oral Argument
10/05/1989Submission
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989
07/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/18/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
80th District Court
Harris
Honorable K. Baker
86-16279