judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-89-00058-CR
06-89-00058-CR
07/11/1989
Assault or Attempted Murder
Fagbemi, Lincoln Biola
The State of Texas
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/16/1990Mandate issued
02/28/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
01/31/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledWRIT REFUSED
11/16/1989Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/30/1989Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
10/02/1989Motion for Extension of Time to File PDR DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/1989Motion to Extend Time for Filing PDR
08/29/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/17/1989Submitted
08/17/1989Submission
07/21/1989Submission
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989
07/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/16/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
Honorable Jay W. Burnett
496,613
5 yrs TDC probated