judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00181-CV
11-89-00181-CV
07/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Loving, Robert
Gamez, Gerardo
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/11/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/1990Mandate issued
08/23/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/21/1990Submitted
05/21/1990Submission set in Eastland
04/23/1990Record checked in
04/10/1990Letter filed from . . .
03/30/1990Record checked out
03/27/1990Submission set in Eastland
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/11/1989Case ready to be set
07/11/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/09/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Loving, RobertAppellantConstance Singleton
Gamez, GerardoAppelleeMurray E. Malakoff
Trial Court Information
269th District Court
Harris
88-33307-A