judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-89-00172-CR
09-89-00172-CR
07/11/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
James, Theophelus
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/03/1990Mandate Issued
02/14/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/17/1990Submitted
01/17/1990Submission
11/30/1989Submission
10/02/1989Brief Filed
10/02/1989Case ready to be set
09/06/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/01/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/14/1989Brief Filed
07/13/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/11/1989Transcript Filed
07/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/03/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
217th District Court
Angelina
Honorable David V. Wilson
14,299
life - TDC