judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-81-00178-CR
12-81-00178-CR
05/19/1982
Revocation of Probation
Martin, Willie Mae
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/27/1984
03/21/1984Mandate Issued
01/19/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/13/1983Submitted
08/03/1983Submission
10/25/1982Brief Filed
09/23/1982Brief Filed
08/25/1982
08/12/1982Motion or Writ Granted
07/30/1982motion for extension of time to file sfacts
07/22/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/20/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/27/1982Motion or Writ Granted
05/21/1982Order Entered
05/17/1982motion for extension of time to file sfacts
05/05/1982motion for extension of time to file sfacts
10/30/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/27/1984Case StoredCase stored
03/27/2009RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
188th District Court
Gregg
12,678-A
2-7 yrs/probated