judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-82-00083-CV
12-82-00083-CV
05/18/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Caterpillar Tractor Company
Dalton Jones d/b/a Jones Dozier Service
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/2002Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
03/21/1985
09/11/1984Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/1984No Description Available.
08/13/1984Mandate Issued
08/13/1984Record returned.
07/18/1984Opinion issuedRefused
06/05/1984ACKNOWLEDGMENT CARD RECEIVED FROM APPEAL COURT
05/25/1984Filing Fee Paid
05/25/1984
04/26/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/20/1984Response to Motion Filed
04/12/1984motion for rehearing filed
04/05/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/21/1984Letter from the Court
02/16/1984Submitted
04/12/1983Supplemental Brief Filed
12/06/1982Brief Filed
11/12/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/08/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/18/1982Brief Filed
09/16/1982Record Filed
07/22/1982Mot ext time file record dispMotion or Writ Granted
07/19/1982
05/20/1982Mot ext time file record dispMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/1982
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2002Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
188th District Court
Gregg
Honorable Alvin G Khoury
80-1451-A