judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00148-CR
08-82-00148-CR
05/17/1982
Other Felony
Rosales, Roberto
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/08/1984Shuck purged
05/11/1984Mandate Issued
02/29/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/13/1984Submitted
11/30/1983Submission
04/02/1983Case ready to be set
03/09/1983Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
03/03/1983Brief Filed
02/16/1983Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/02/1983Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/19/1983Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/03/1983Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/15/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/02/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
11/08/1982Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
11/03/1982Transcript Filed
09/15/1982Motion for Ext Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/03/1982Motion - Extension to File Transcript filed
05/27/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
05/17/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/11/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
County Court
El Paso
Honorable Herbert E. Cooper
81-33631-5
2 yrs + $200 & $65 ct cost