judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-82-00134-CV
08-82-00134-CV
05/17/1982
Contract
Chandler, Richard L.
McCormick, Edward E. et al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1984Shuck purged
07/12/1983Mandate Issued
06/01/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/18/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/04/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/22/1983Submitted
03/16/1983Submission
02/28/1983Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
02/24/1983Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
10/25/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
09/29/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/13/1982No description available.
09/01/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
08/18/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/18/1982Sup. St. of Facts Filed
08/02/1982No description available.
06/10/1982Brief Filed
06/09/1982No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/26/1982No description available.
05/19/1982Brief Filed
05/17/1982Statement of Facts Filed
05/17/1982Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
65th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Edward Marquez
77-6770