judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANTES VS. DANTES

Case Information: 33433
Short Caption:DANTES VS. DANTESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A362079Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/22/1998 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/07/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
12/07/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00277
12/07/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
12/07/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
12/16/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 12/04/98. 98-00400
12/21/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Rawlings, Olson, Cannon, Gormley & Desruisseaux-check no. 040791.
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/05/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. (Late and handwritten). 99-00030
01/07/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant/Appellant Edmond Dantes. 99-00081
01/14/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion Requesting Extension of Time Within Which to File Defendant/Appellant's Docketing Statement 99-00262
01/19/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Document: docketing statement. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on January 14, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-00326
01/19/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00263
01/26/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Mailed on: 1/25/99. 99-00532
01/26/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Mailed on: 1/25/99. 99-00533
02/09/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is hereby dismissed." The pending motion to withdraw as appellant's counsel is denied as moot. NRAP 42(b). NNP 99-00884