judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: JAMES ANTONIO BLUE, APLT

Case Information: 10-FM-1293
Short Caption:IN RE: JAMES ANTONIO BLUE, APLTClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO56-10Filed Date:10/15/2010

Opening Event Date:10/15/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/29/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames Antonio BlueY
Charles H. Fitzpatrick NN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/18/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Charles Fitzpatrick, Esquire, ishereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/08/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 9/15/10 (rt. needed)
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (37 pgs/Tape - 9/15/10 proc.) w/cd
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
01/06/2011RECORD COPIES
01/06/2011RECORD INDEX
02/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 5/16/11. no oppo
02/18/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 16, 2011. (JAC)
05/12/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 6/16/11
05/19/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief,to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 16, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
05/27/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL w/affidavt
06/07/2011ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
06/07/2011DISMISSED
06/29/2011MANDATE ISSUED