judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRIAN LEE DUKE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0132)
Parent: S-07-0298 Case Docketed On:06/20/2008
Consolidated:S-08-0132
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:BRIAN LEE DUKE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BRIAN LEE DUKE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrian Lee DukeDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2009 WY 74
Citation:209 P.3d 563

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/20/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/27/2008Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
06/27/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion to consolidate.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/15/2008Order - Consolidating cases - Case S-08-0132 consolidated into S-07-0298 for purposes of argument (if any) and decision. There will be no further briefing in S-08-0132.OrderConsolidating casesFinal
07/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/17/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham M. Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/20/2008Order - Other - emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument, Justice Kite unavailableOrderOtherFinal
10/20/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/03/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/19/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/23/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 6/22/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal