judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00243-CV
04-82-00243-CV
05/17/1982
Automobile Personal Injury
Gilbert, Houston A.
Huber, Hunt and Nichols, Inc., et al.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/06/1984Mandate Issued
08/06/1984Mandate Issued
07/23/1984Case Returned from Higher Court
06/13/1984Higher Court DecisionRefused
04/26/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/23/1984Writ of Error filed
03/27/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/21/1984Response to Motion Filed
03/14/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/29/1984Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
02/29/1984Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
09/13/1983Submission
09/13/1983Submitted
07/13/1983Waives Oral Argument
07/01/1983Case ready to be set
07/01/1983Case ready to be set
08/04/1982Requests Oral Argument
08/04/1982Requests Oral Argument
08/03/1982Requests Oral Argument
07/23/1982Brief Filed
07/23/1982Brief Filed
06/28/1982Brief Filed
06/01/1982No Description Available.
05/28/1982No Description Available.
05/28/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/17/1982Appeal Bond Filed
02/19/1982Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/06/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
166th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable David Peeples
78-CI-5064