judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00350-CV
01-82-00350-CV
05/17/1982
Injunction
Gordon, Solomon S. et al
Sandra S. Jasso
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/01/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/27/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
01/24/1983Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
01/13/1983Motion for rehearing filed
12/30/1982Opinion issuedReformed and Affirmed
12/01/1982Submitted
10/29/1982Submission
06/25/1982Brief filed
06/15/1982Motion to dismiss appeal
06/02/1982Brief filed
05/20/1982Statement of facts filed
05/17/1982Transcript filed
05/06/1982Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/01/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellee
StateAppellant
Trial Court Information
165th District Court
Harris
82-21337