judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00066-CR
09-82-00066-CR
05/18/1982
Rape
Purkey, James Otis
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/18/1983Mandate Issued
08/17/1983Case Returned from Higher Ct.
07/20/1983Petition for ReviewRefused
05/18/1983Petition for Review
04/20/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/22/1983Brief Filed
03/11/1983Brief Filed
02/09/1983Opinion issuedNo Description Available.
05/18/1982Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/18/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
37373
99 years TDC