judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00278-CV
04-82-00278-CV
05/18/1982
Divorce
Dundon, Martha
Zulfer, Charles F.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/23/1984Mandate Issued
02/23/1984Mandate Issued
01/04/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/04/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/21/1983Submission
09/21/1983Submitted
07/18/1983Requests Oral Argument
07/12/1983Requests Oral Argument
07/01/1983Case ready to be set
09/30/1982Requests Oral Argument
09/30/1982Case ready to be set
09/29/1982Requests Oral Argument
09/21/1982Brief Filed
08/27/1982Brief Filed
07/28/1982No Description Available.
07/20/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/12/1982Affidavit for Motion Filed
07/09/1982Filing fee has been paid
07/02/1982No Description Available.
06/18/1982No Description Available.
06/18/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/18/1982Appeal Bond Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/23/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
225th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carol R. Haberman
82-CI-420