judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DIPASQUALE VS. ATTORNEY GENERAL

Case Information: 33432
Short Caption:DIPASQUALE VS. ATTORNEY GENERALCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A363179Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/21/1999How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/07/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Roseann Dipasquale--Albertsons' M.O. # 02448579401.
12/07/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00276
02/11/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 99-00965
03/19/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 and 2. Mailed on: 3/17/99. 99-02022
03/19/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/24/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Non-jury Trial--1-/13/98. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. (Note: received two copies of the same transcript.) 99-02133
03/31/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. Appellants have filed a motion pursuant to NRAP 46(b) seeking to submit a brief to the court. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a brief not to exceed 5 pages. Respondent shall then have 30 days from the date that appellants file their brief to file an answering brief not to exceed 5 pages. Appellants shall not file an appendix or a reply brief. 99-02366
04/23/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Appellants' Motion to Extend Brief. 99-03199
04/28/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. "Appellants Reply to Respondent's Response to Motion to Extend Pages."
04/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk is instructed to file the motion received from appellants on April 21, 1999, and to file the brief received from appellants on April 22, 1999. Respondent may file a brief of 9 pages, exclusive of a table of contents, a table of citations, and any addendum. The briefing schedule shall remain the same. No reply brief or other supplementation may be filed after respondent has filed its responding brief. 99-03385
04/29/1999MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. 99-03179
04/29/1999BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. 99-03180
05/21/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Notice of Appearance. Jane D. Femiano, Deputy Attorney General, as counsel for respondents. 99-04199
05/21/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 5/20/99. 99-04200
05/21/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/09/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: . . . We ORDER this appeal dismissed. fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person other than the opening brief, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant.]NNP99A-CY/MS/ML. 99-06109
08/20/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motion for Enlargement of Time. On July 28, 1999, we received from appellants a proper person request for enlargement of time to file a petition for rehearing, which we construe as a motion for enlargement of time. The motion is denied. fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant]. NNP99A-CY.MS/ML 99-07778
08/20/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2. 99-07811
08/20/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/07/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 27, 1999. 99-07811