judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAMAR OUTDOOR ADVERTISING v. FARMERS CO-OP OIL COMPANY OF SHERIDAN, WYOMING and MAVERIK COUNTRY STORES

Case Heading (S-08-0131)
Case Number:S-08-0131Case Docketed On:06/19/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16)
Short Title:LAMAR OUTDOOR ADVERTISING v. FARMERS CO-OP OIL COMPANY OF SHERIDAN, WYOMING and MAVERIK COUNTRY STORES
Full Title:LAMAR OUTDOOR ADVERTISING, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. FARMERS CO-OP OIL COMPANY OF SHERIDAN, WYOMING and MAVERIK COUNTRY STORES, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLamar Outdoor AdvertisingTimothy M. Stubson
AppelleeFarmer's Co-op Oil Company of Sheridan, WyomingClint Andrew Langer
AppelleeMaverick Country StoresSteven T. Waterman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts
Opinion Number:2009 WY 112
Citation:215 P.3d 296

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/19/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/19/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/04/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/05/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellant and received copy of designation of recordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/18/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/22/2008Event - Hardcopy received - joint brief of appelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/03/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from district court clerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/08/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/15/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Steven Waterman for appellee Maverik; Clint Langer for appellee Farmer's Co-op; and Timothy Stubson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/19/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Timothy M. Stubson for appellant; Clint Andrew Langer for appellee Farmer's Co-op; and Steven T. Waterman for appellee Maverick Country Stores) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Change of address for Mr. Waterman.Notice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
04/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Change of Address (Untimely, received seven days late)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/11/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/02/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/02/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/04/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/03/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal