judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LANIER ASSOCIATES V. THEODORE PAWLIK

Case Information: 10-CV-1290
Short Caption:LANIER ASSOCIATES V. THEODORE PAWLIKClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB11473-10Filed Date:10/12/2010

Opening Event Date:10/12/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/05/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLanier AssociatesN
Stephen O. HesslerNY
AppelleeTheodore Pawlik N
Shankar Duraiswamy NN
Franciska A. Coleman NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/12/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/03/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER. See DC Code 11-721 (2001). (BY: ETW)
11/03/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC - appellee's motion to dismiss
11/22/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's).
12/03/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
12/13/2010 ORDRED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED (OBNBFA) (jl)
12/13/2010DISMISSED
01/05/2011ERROR-REUSE
01/05/2011MANDATE ISSUED