judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-82-00049-CV
09-82-00049-CV
05/19/1982
Miscellaneous civil
State Dept. of Highways and Public Transportation
Trapp, Martha et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/21/1982Case stored
10/21/1982Mandate Issued
10/21/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/16/1982Brief Filed
07/15/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
06/18/1982Brief Filed
05/19/1982Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/21/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
159th District Court
Angelina
Honorable David Walker
16,210-75-12