judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-82-00337-CV
14-82-00337-CV
05/19/1982
Divorce
Tippen, James
Tippen, Bobbie Jean
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/13/1983Mandate Issued
09/13/1983Mandate Issued
07/28/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/14/1982Exhibits Filed
10/14/1982No description available.GRANTED
09/27/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
09/23/1982Opposition filed
09/16/1982No description available.
09/03/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
08/04/1982Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
07/15/1982Extend time to file record FILED-ANT,APEGRANTED
07/15/1982Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
07/15/1982Transcript FILED
06/28/1982Opposition filed
06/09/1982Extend time to file record FILED - ANT, APE, APP
06/07/1982Affidavit filed
05/20/1982Extend time to file record FILED - ANT, APE, APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/13/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellee
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellant
Trial Court Information
328th District Court
Fort Bend
36,933