judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-82-00074-CV
10-82-00074-CV
05/19/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Navarro County Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Reverend James G. Prince
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/13/2001Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/02/1982Case stored
11/02/1982Mandate issued by this Court
09/16/1982Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
09/09/1982Submitted
05/19/1982Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/13/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
87th District Court
Freestone
9087-B