judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00618-CR
05-82-00618-CR
05/19/1982
Sexual Abuse, Rape or Injury of a Child
Morgan, Danny Marshall
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/31/1985Mandate Issued
07/12/1985Opinion issuedCt App Rev & Jud Tr Ct Affirmd
12/22/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
11/09/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Dismissed
09/19/1983Submitted
08/05/1983Submission
05/19/1983Brief Filed
05/12/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/12/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/08/1983Brief Filed
01/21/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/04/1983Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
11/15/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1982Mot Ext Time File Record DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/19/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/31/1985Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
291st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gerry Holden Meier
f81-27793-su
5 yrs tdc