judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-82-00084-CV
12-82-00084-CV
05/18/1982
Miscellaneous civil
Scharnagel, A. R., NCM
Brady, Anita Scharnagel, GDN
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/2002Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
02/23/1984Mandate Issued
01/19/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/15/1983Submitted
10/20/1983Submission
09/08/1982Brief Filed
08/18/1982Brief Filed
07/19/1982
06/03/1982Motion or Writ Granted
05/18/1982No Description Available.
05/18/1982motion for extension of time to file sfacts
05/18/1982Filing Fee Paid
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2002Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
123rd District Court
A-8176