judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CHARLES D. WYCHE v. SIDNEY PERRIN

Case: A-2649
A-2649
04/13/1950
Application for Writ of Error
CHARLES D. WYCHE
SIDNEY PERRIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/18/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/22/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
04/20/1950Response to PetitionPetitioner
04/13/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
04/13/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/24/1950Response to Motion filed
05/18/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/22/1950Response to Petition
04/20/1950Response to Petition
04/13/1950Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/13/1950Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/13/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sidney PerrinRespondent
Charles D. WychePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information