judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAY EDWARD PORTER, ETAL V. WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER, ETAL

Case Information: 10-CV-1291
Short Caption:JAY EDWARD PORTER, ETAL V. WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER, ETALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAM3591-10Filed Date:10/18/2010

Opening Event Date:10/18/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/29/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJay Edward Porter N
Jonathan B. NaceNY
AppellantDebi Porter N
Jonathan B. NaceNY
AppelleeWashington Hospital CenterN
Daniel C. CostelloNY
AppelleeAnantha K. Rao N
Daniel C. CostelloNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/18/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/08/2010 ORDERED that appellant, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED as the case is ongoing in the trial court... (BY: ETW)
12/02/2010STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL
12/07/2010 ORDERED that THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED W/O PREJUDICE and each party shall bear their own costs. (BY: ETW) LW
12/07/2010DISMISSED
12/29/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived