judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HANSEN (ROY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33434
Short Caption:HANSEN (ROY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 7258Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/07/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/07/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 98-00280
01/04/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-00019
01/06/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. 09/14/98; 09/15/98; 09/16/98; and 11/06/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Lisa M. Manley. 99-00065
01/08/1999MotionFiled Motion. 99-00104
01/14/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal from Appellant filed in the district court on January 11, 1999. 99-00265
01/21/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-00414
01/21/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. Appendix to Fast Track Response. 99-00415
05/12/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[On January 8, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw as counsel. The motion is denied as moot. We have considered all proper person documents filed or receivd in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted]. NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-03867
06/08/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-04823
06/08/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/15/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 10, 1999. 99-04823