judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8611
B-8611
07/05/1979
Application for Writ of Error
SHRINERS HOSPITIAL FOR CRIPPLED CHILDREN, TEXAS SCOTTISH RITE HOSPITAL FOR CRIPPLED CHILDREN, CLARK MURRAY, JOHN L. HILL, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS, IRENE T. WILLIAMS, INDEPENDENT EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF THOMAS J. WILLIAMS, TEXAS SCOTTISH RITE HOSPITA
OLA MAE STAHL, ESTA GERMER, JOYCE DAWSON, THOMAS J. WILLIAMS AND BILLY JOE STAHL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/13/1981Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/12/1980Response to Brief filedPetitioner
01/11/1980Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/09/1980Letter brief Petitioner
01/08/1980Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/04/1980Response to Brief filedRespondent
11/15/1979Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
11/14/1979Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
08/07/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
07/05/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
07/05/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
07/05/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
07/05/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/27/1981Response to Motion filed
01/13/1981Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/31/1980Opinion issued
02/12/1980Response to Brief filed
01/11/1980Supplemental Brief filed
01/09/1980Letter brief
01/08/1980Supplemental Brief filed
01/04/1980Response to Brief filed
11/15/1979Brief on the Merits
11/15/1979Response to Motion filed
11/14/1979Supplemental Brief filed
11/08/1979Motion for extension of time to argue. See remarks
10/17/1979Document received (See Remarks)
10/17/1979Document received (See Remarks)
10/17/1979Document received (See Remarks)
08/07/1979Response to Petition
07/10/1979Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
07/05/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/05/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/05/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/05/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/05/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Scottish Rite Hospital for Crippled Children, et al.Petitioner
Mark White, Attorney General of TexasPetitioner
Irene T. Williams, Independent Executrix of the Estate of Thomas J. WilliamsPetitioner
Shriners Hospitial for Crippled Children, Texas Scottish Rite Hospital for Crippled Children, Clark Murray, John L. Hill, Attorney General of TexasPetitioner
Ola Mae Stahl, Esta Germer, Joyce Dawson, Thomas J. WIlliams and Billy Joe StahlRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information