judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8609
B-8609
07/03/1979
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
RUDOLFO A. REYES
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/09/1979Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/26/1979Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/05/1979Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/18/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
07/03/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/10/1979Response to Motion filed
10/09/1979Reply to Response
09/26/1979Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/05/1979Reply to Response
08/22/1979Response to Motion filed
07/27/1979Motion to ExpediteFiling granted
07/18/1979Response to Petition
07/03/1979Document received (See Remarks)
07/03/1979Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/03/1979Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Employers Insurance AssociationPetitioner
Rudolfo A. ReyesRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information