judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

INDUSTRIAL ACCIDENT BOARD OF THE STATE OF TEXAS v. F. M. MIEARS

Case: A-2642
A-2642
04/11/1950
Application for Writ of Error
INDUSTRIAL ACCIDENT BOARD OF THE STATE OF TEXAS
F. M. MIEARS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/13/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/02/1950Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
04/26/1950Response to PetitionPetitioner
04/11/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
04/11/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/13/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/28/1950Opinion issued
06/02/1950Supplemental Brief filed
05/03/1950Document received (See Remarks)
04/26/1950Response to Petition
04/17/1950Letter Filed
04/11/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/11/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/11/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Industrial Accident Board of the State of TexasPetitioner
F. M. MiearsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information