judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TURNER (EARL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33440
Short Caption:TURNER (EARL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C122255Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/12/2000 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/12/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/08/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/08/1998MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Request for Extension of Time to File Transcript and Docket on Appeal. 98-00297
02/05/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney Kent has failed to take any action in this court with respect to the prosecution of the appeal. On December 8, 1998, attorney Donald D. Beury filed a motion. We grant attorney Beury's unopposed motion. The clerk shall file the record on appeal provisionally received on December 18, 1998. Appellant shall, within 60 days of this order, file and serve an opening brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn1 [The notice of appeal having been field prior to September 1, 1996, the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure in effect prior to that date apply to this appeal.] Counsel's (Kent) delay in excess of three years in prosecuting this appeal is unacceptable. We refer attorney Kent to the State Bar of Nevad for investigation and, if appropriate, disciplinary proceedings. 99-00848
02/05/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 98-00429
02/23/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 01/09/95; 01/26/95; 04/28/95; 05/02/95; 05/03/95; and 05/04/95 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 99-01235
04/07/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 4/5/99. 99-02599
05/06/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 99-03636
06/21/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-05349
06/22/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Brief due: on or before July 12, 1999. 99-05440
07/29/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Request to File His Reply Brief Late. 99-06957
08/03/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The reply brief provisionally submitted on July 29, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-07085
08/03/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. 99-06958
12/03/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for January 12, 2000 at the hour of 10:00 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas.(SNP99B-WM, MS, NB)
12/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 99-13075
01/12/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Oral argument before the Southern Nevada Panel: submitted. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
03/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-03587
04/04/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-05383
04/04/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 18, 2000. 00-05383