judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD G. BLOOMER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0139)
Case Number:S-08-0139Case Docketed On:06/27/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:RICHARD G. BLOOMER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD G. BLOOMER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard Gordon BloomerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Eric Alan Johnson
Eric K. Thompson
Curtis H. Cheney

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing, Sentencing, Trial
Opinion Number:2009 WY 77
Citation:209 P.3d 574

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/27/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion for extension of timeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/06/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/07/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/26/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/26/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellant and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Curtis H. Cheney, Student Intern, to appear on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
11/10/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/12/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellee, consent and approval for Curtis H. Cheney to appear and copy of designation of recordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/14/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Curtis Cheney, Student Intern for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/01/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Eric K. Thompson to appear on behalf of AppelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
12/02/2008Event - Hardcopy received Consent and Approval for Eric K. Thompson to appear on behalf of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/08/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, exhibits; Volume IV, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/17/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full Court (Tina N. Kerin for appellant; and D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General, Curtis H. Cheney, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Cheney for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
12/17/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/12/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the Court. Chief Justice Voigt filed a dissenting opinion in which Justice Burke joined, Justice Burke filed a separate dissenting opinionOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/30/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/30/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/06/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/2/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal