judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SANDY R. JARMON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1301
Short Caption:SANDY R. JARMON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1815-10Filed Date:10/19/2010

Opening Event Date:10/19/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/15/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/29/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/23/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSandy R. Jarmon Y
Rahkel BouchetYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/19/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/01/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Rahkel Bouchet, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/01/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Rahkel Bouchet, Esquire
11/18/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
11/18/2010RECEIVED- motion for appeal transcript
12/21/2010RECEIVED - aplt's brief
12/21/2010RECEIVED - aplt's appdx (attachted to brief)
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (72pgs/Tape) 9/24/10 proc.
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (6pgs/Tape) 10/5/10 proc. w/CD
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/07/2011ORDERED: That the appellant's brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
01/07/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
01/26/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
01/26/2011RECEIVED - aple's brief
02/15/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee's motion is granted and the lodged brief is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (By: JAC)
02/15/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
02/15/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/12/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
06/29/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/29/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Ruiz, Thompson, King
09/01/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) Ruiz and Thompson, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
09/23/2011FiledMandate