judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: WR-8,231-01
WR-8,231-01
07/11/1979
1107-HC
MOREHEAD, THIRLON, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/13/1980ACTION TAKENFile and set
12/17/1979SUPP RECD
09/19/1979ORDER ISSUEDHC Remanded to trial court for evidentiary hearing
07/11/1979WRIT RECEIVED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/13/1980FILEDFILE & SET
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Morehead, Thirlon, Jr.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
W-79-20028-I