judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-8627
B-8627
07/12/1979
Application for Writ of Error
VIRGINIA ADAIR
GEORGE ROLAND MARTIN, JIM CARL MARTIN, AND RAYMOND IRE MARTIN, EXECUTORS OF THE ESTATE OF JAMES E. MARTIN, DECEASED
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/14/1980Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/22/1980Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
01/18/1980Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
12/17/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
07/12/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/19/1980Opinion issued
02/14/1980Motion for RehearingFiling granted
01/30/1980Opinion issued
01/22/1980Supplemental Brief filed
01/18/1980Supplemental Brief filed
12/17/1979Response to Petition
07/18/1979Document received (See Remarks)
07/12/1979Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
George Roland Martin, Jim Carl Martin, and Raymond Ire Martin, Executors of the Estate of James E. Martin, deceasedRespondent
Virginia AdairPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information