judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NAT'L RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP. V. D.C. COMM. ON HUMAN RTS

Case Information: 80-AA-1278
Short Caption:NAT'L RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP. V. D.C. COMM. ON HUMAN RTSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Commission On Human Rights (CHR)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:11/07/1980

Opening Event Date:11/07/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/31/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/13/1981
Argued/Submitted:11/24/1981
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-RespondentJohn Doe N
Harry Alexander NN
PetitionerNational Railroad Passenger CorporationN
Anthony L. Mondello NN
RespondentD.C. Commission on Human RightsN
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901NAT'L RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP. (AMTRAK) CHR
01/01/1906 ALEXANDERH MOVANT FOR BERTHA C. DUPRE
11/07/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/31/1980FiledRecord Completed
07/13/1981FiledBriefing Completed
11/24/1981FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/26/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition