judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TIM MERCHANT, DICK BLUST, JR. and STEPHEN EARL BARNESKI v. DAVID GRAY, individually and in his official capacity as SWEETWATER COUNTY SHERIFF; THE SWEETWATER COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE and THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF SWEETWATER COUNTY, WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0060)
Case Number:S-07-0060Case Docketed On:03/15/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:TIM MERCHANT, DICK BLUST, JR. and STEPHEN EARL BARNESKI v. DAVID GRAY, individually and in his official capacity as SWEETWATER COUNTY SHERIFF; THE SWEETWATER COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE and THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF SWEETWATER COUNTY, WYOMING
Full Title:TIM MERCHANT, DICK BLUST, JR. and STEPHEN EARL BARNESKI, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. DAVID GRAY, individually and in his official capacity as SWEETWATER COUNTY SHERIFF; THE SWEETWATER COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE and THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF SWEETWATER COUNTY, WYOMING, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTim MerchantV. Anthony Vehar
AppellantDick Blust Jr.Mary Elizabeth Galvan
AppellantStephen Earl BarneskiMary Elizabeth Galvan
AppelleeDavid GrayPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Theodore R. Racines
Richard Rideout
AppelleeSweetwater County Sheriff's OfficeRichard Rideout
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Sweetwater County, WyomingRichard Rideout

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 208
Citation:173 P.3d 410

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/15/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/15/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/15/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/27/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
05/02/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from appellantsNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/14/2007Brief - Appellees; and received copy of appellees' designation of record.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/14/2007Notice-Incoming - Statement of costs, appellees.Notice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
06/14/2007Brief - Appellee, David Gray, in his individual capacity; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/02/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/18/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/18/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Richard Rideout on behalf appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mary Elizabeth Galvan for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Theodore Racines for appellee Sweetwater County SheriffNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/19/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Mary Elizabeth Galvan for appellant; Theodore Rafael Racines, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Richard Rideout for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/19/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/28/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing for lack of jurisdiction, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/15/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/18/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/16/08 by E. Smith.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal