judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH (WAYNE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34618
Short Caption:SMITH (WAYNE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37935
Lower Court Case(s):Storey Co. - First Judicial District - CR19347Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/04/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/04/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07171
08/04/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 23, 1999. Court Reporter: Karen Yates. 99-07179
08/30/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Fast track statement with appendix. 99-08119
09/20/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-08900
11/19/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11520
12/15/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-12628
12/15/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 16, 1999. 99-12628