judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. OLEJACK (LOUIS)

Case Information: 33441
Short Caption:STATE VS. OLEJACK (LOUIS)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR98P0631Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/08/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/08/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 98-00299
01/05/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: dated November 13, 1998. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 99-00045
01/08/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-00116
01/08/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 99-00117
02/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Fast track response due: 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for respondent should not be sanctioned. 99-01035
02/18/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to File Late Fast Track Response. 99-01108
03/01/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Disapproved. The fast track response was received on February 18, 1999, within the time allowed by this court. Nothwithstanding the disapproval of the stipulation for an extension of time, the clerk shall file, forthwith, the fast track response received on February 18, 1999. 99-01354
03/01/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-01114
03/31/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. Judgment: " . . .we vacate the district court's order granting respondent one hundred sixty-one (161) days of credit for presentence incarceration and remand this case to the district court with instructions to correct the judgment of conviction to reflect that respondent shall receive no crredit for presentence incarceration toward his sentence in this case." fn1 We have reviewed respondent's remaining contentions in his petition below, and conclude that they lack merit and fail to provide any basis upon which the district court could have properly granted relief. NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-02400
04/27/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-03318
04/27/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/04/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 28, 1999. 99-03318