Administrative Case: ADKT 0269 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: STANDARDIZED FORMS FOR PROTECTION ORDERS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Classification: | Administrative - ADKT - ADKT | Case Status: | Case Closed |
Filed Date: | 01/08/1998 | Public Hearing: | |
Closed Date: | 03/01/2011 |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/08/1998 | Administrative Case | Filed Petition for Designation of Study Committee. | 98-00649 | |
03/24/1998 | Administrative Case | Public Hearing on the Administrative Docket. | ||
04/17/1998 | Administrative Case | Filed Order a committee shall be formed to study this matter. The Honorable Scott Jordan and Sue Meuschke shall be appointed to serve as co-chairs of this study committee. The study committee shall present its findings and recommendations to this court within 90 days of the date of this order. | 98-00650 | |
06/24/1998 | Administrative Case | Filed Amended Order Appointing Members of Study Committee. Liz Watson shall be removed and replaced with Mary Rose Zingale. The study committee shall present its proposed standardized froms to this court withih 180 days of the date of this order. | 98-00651 | |
12/28/1998 | Administrative Case | Filed Motion for Adoption of Standardized Forms for Use in Domestic Violence Protection Order Cases. | 98-00652 | |
04/16/1999 | Administrative Case | Public Meeting on the Administrative Docket. | ||
06/01/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Adoption of Standardized Forms for use in Domestic Violence Protection Order Cases. The standardized forms developed by the study committee, attached as Exhibits 1 through 7, are adopted and approved for immediate use on a voluntary basis by the district courts and justice courts of the State; the study committee shall meet on or before November 30, 1999, to review and revise the forms, if necessary; the committee shall file with this court by January 31, 2000, supplemental findings and proposed changes to the forms, if any; this court's permanent adoption of the forms for mandatory use shall be deferred pending the study committee's findings and recommendations. | 99-13512 | |
01/31/2000 | Administrative Case | Filed Motion for Adoption of Standardized Forms for Mandatory Use in Domestic Violence Protection Order Cases. | 00-22831 | |
04/26/2000 | Administrative Case | Public meeting on the administrative docket. | ||
06/07/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Adoption of Standardized Forms for Mandatory Use in Domestic Violence Protection Order Cases. Effective immediately. The study committee shall meet on or before November 1, 2000, to review and revise the five additional forms, if necessary. The committee shall file with this court by January 1, 2001, supplemental findings and proposed changes to the forms, if any; this court's permanent adoption of the additional five forms for mandatory use shall be deferred pending the study committee's findings and recommendations. | 00-22832 | |
03/28/2002 | Administrative Case | Filed Motion for Adoption of Standardized Forms for Use in Domestic Violence Protection Order Cases. | 02-22324 | |
07/26/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Adoption of Standardized Forms for Mandatory Use in Domestic Violence Protection Order Cases. This order was not published. | 02-22325 | |
07/26/2002 | Case Status Update | Case Closed | ||
12/05/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Adopting Standardized Domestic Violence Forms. Effective immediately, in all cases involving orders for protection against domestic violence issues . . . the courts of the State of Nevada shall use the four standardized forms (copies attached as Exhibits A through D). The courts may use the six standardized forms (copies attached as Exhibits E through K). | 08-33297 | |
12/05/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed | ||
12/27/2010 | Administrative Case | Case Reopened | ||
12/27/2010 | Administrative Case | Filed Order Adopting Standardized Protection Order Forms. Effective immediately, in all cases involving orders for protection in accordance with provisions set forth in NRS chapter 33, the courts of the State of Nevada shall use the three standardized forms (copies attached as exhibits A through C); in all cases involving orders for protection against domestic violence and in all cases involving orders for protection, it is recommended that the courts use the six standardized forms developed by Standardized Protection Order Forms Committee, (Exhibits D through I); in all cases involving orders for protection, the courts may use the six standardized forms developed by Standardized Protection Order Forms Committee (Exhibits J through O). | 10-33632 | |
03/01/2011 | Administrative Case | Case Closed. | ||
07/05/2019 | Administrative Case | Case Reopened. (SC) | ||
07/05/2019 | Administrative Case | Filed Order filed to reconvene committee. The individuals listed in exhibit A are appointed to the committee. (S) | 19-28735 | |
05/19/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Petition. | 20-19023 | |
06/04/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Order Adopting Standardized Forms for Protection Orders. (SC) | 20-20955 | |
07/02/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Order. On June 4, 2020, this court entered an order adopting standardized forms for protection orders, which are due to become effective on July 6, 2020. In light of the current COVID-19 pandemic, we direct that the use of standardized forms for protection orders is discretionary as of July 6, 2020. Their use will become mandatory on November 1, 2020. | 20-24570 | |
07/24/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Petition. (SC). | 20-27051 | |
07/27/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Order Adopting Standardized Forms for Protection Orders. | 20-27264 | |
09/25/2020 | Administrative Case | Filed Order. The Administrative Office of the Courts shall maintain the standardize forms, determine when revisions to the forms are necessary, make any technical revisions to the forms when necessary without submitting a new petition or requesting a hearing, and submit any needed substantive revisions to the forms to the JCSN; It is further ordered that the JCSN shall consider any substantive revisions of the forms recommended by the Administrative Office of the Courts and determine whether the revisions can be made by the JCSN or whether the Committee should be reconvened. Substantive revisions to the forms must be submitted to this court for final approval before distribution; and it is further ordered that the Committee is dissolved having completed the tasks assigned to it. | 20-35428 | |
09/25/2020 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. |