Case: B-3776
B-3776
01/16/1973
Application for Writ of Error
RAYMOND MERCOLA
CITY OF SAN ANTONIO, MARTIN WRIGHT ELECTRIC COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/16/1973 | Errata Filed | Respondent | | |
02/13/1973 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/29/1973 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/16/1973 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/16/1973 | Errata Filed | | ||
02/13/1973 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/31/1973 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
01/29/1973 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/16/1973 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
01/16/1973 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
City of San Antonio by and through City Public Service Board of San Antonio | Respondent | |
Raymond Mercola | Petitioner | |
Martin Wright Electric Company | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information