Case Information: 60089 | |||
Short Caption: | DRAKE VS. LERUD | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 58631 , 65984 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PI100747 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/04/2012 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/24/2012 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. | ||
01/24/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 12-02483 | |
02/08/2012 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. Transcript Requested: January 6, 2012. Court Reporter for Judge Wagner. | 12-04217 | |
02/21/2012 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 12-05406 | |
02/21/2012 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Proper Person Motion for Leave to File the Exhibits of Court Record Germane to Civil Statement In Lieu of Transcript. | 12-05409 | |
02/21/2012 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Appellant's Proposed Exhibits of Court Record Germane to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement, Lieu Transcript. | 12-05412 | |
03/13/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Clark Leslie of NV AG Office appearing on behalf of respondents Alicia LeRud; Carol Nelsen and Patricia Reeves). | 12-07956 | |
03/28/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record and Denying Motion for Leave to File Exhibits. Record due: 30 days. On February 21, 2012, appellant filed a motion for leave to file "exhibits of court record." Having considered the motion, we deny it. Therefore, in resolving this appeal, this court will disregard any documents that appellant submitted with his motion that are not properly part of the record on appeal. | 12-09817 | |
04/04/2012 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vols 1 & 2. | ||
04/04/2012 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/06/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Response. Respondents: Response due: 30 days. | 13-16591 | |
07/02/2013 | Brief | Filed Response to Appellant's Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 13-19469 | |
07/02/2013 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix to Brief. | 13-19470 | |
07/11/2013 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Proper Person Reply to Respondents' Response to Order Directing a Response. | 13-20351 | |
07/25/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to File Reply. The clerk of this court shall file the reply, provisionally received in this court on July 11, 2013. | 13-21941 | |
07/25/2013 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Proposed Reply to Respondents' Response to Appellant's Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 13-21942 | |
11/14/2013 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP13-MG/MD/NS. | 13-34322 | |
12/16/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 13-38113 | |
12/16/2013 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/23/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2013. | 13-38113 |