Case Information: 60088 | |||
Short Caption: | LUCKETT VS. SIMON, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 59371 , 59533 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A623647 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/24/2012 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
01/24/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. | 12-02470 | |
01/24/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | 12-02474 | |
02/02/2012 | Motion | Filed Request for Leave of Court to Waive Court Costs, Security Bonds, Filing Fees (Denied by Trial Court on or about 1/11/12) and Motion to Consolidate (all) Matters. | 12-03635 | |
04/06/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Appellant: Filing Fee due: 10 days. | 15-10263 | |
04/20/2015 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for Reconsideration Re: Application to Waive Fees in Case. | 15-11822 | |
06/16/2015 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. This proper person appeal was docketed in this court without payment of the requisite filing fee. On April 6, 2015, this court denied appellant's request to proceed in forma pauperis and directed him to pay the filing fee within 10 days or the appeal would be dismissed. More than 10 days have passed, but appellant has not paid the filing fee. On April 20, 2015, appellant filed a motion for reconsideration of our April 6, 2015, order. No good cause appearing, the motion for reconsideration is denied. "This appeal is dismissed." SNP-JH | 15-18367 | |
07/13/2015 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 15-21086 | |
07/13/2015 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/30/2015 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 17, 2015. | 15-21086 |