Case: B-3783
B-3783
01/18/1973
Application for Writ of Error
R. O.ROBINSON
ROBBINS PETROLEUM CORPORATION, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/19/1973 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
12/05/1973 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
11/19/1973 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
08/09/1973 | Supplemental Brief filed | Respondent | | |
02/06/1973 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
01/18/1973 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/19/1973 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
12/05/1973 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
11/19/1973 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/14/1973 | Opinion issued | | ||
08/09/1973 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
06/01/1973 | Motion to re-set submission date filed. | Filing granted | | |
04/18/1973 | Motion to re-set submission date filed. | Filing granted | | |
03/28/1973 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/06/1973 | Response to Petition | | ||
01/18/1973 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
01/18/1973 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Wallace N. Masters | Amicus Curiae | |
W. M. Thacker, Jr. and M. E. McCullough | Amicus Curiae | |
R. O.Robinson | Petitioner | |
Robbins Petroleum Corporation, et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information