judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: RULES FOR THE NEVADA COMMISSION ON JUDICIAL DISCIPLINE

Administrative Case: ADKT 0255
Short Caption:IN RE: RULES FOR THE NEVADA COMMISSION ON JUDICIAL DISCIPLINECourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Case Closed
Filed Date:04/08/1997Public Hearing:
Closed Date:07/16/1997

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/08/1997Administrative CaseFiled Petition. 97-00038
04/24/1997Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
05/12/1997Administrative CaseFiled Commentary of Justice Charles Springer with Regard to Proposed Amendments to ARJD 12. 97-00039
05/19/1997Administrative CaseFiled Response to Commentary of Justice Charles Springer with Regard to Proposed Amendments to ARJD 12. 97-00040
05/22/1997Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket
07/16/1997Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending the Administrative and Procedural Rules for the Nevada Commission on Judicial Discipline (Part VII of the Supreme Court Rules). Effective September 1, 1997. 97-00041
07/16/1997Administrative CaseCase Closed.