Case Information: 60090 | |||
Short Caption: | NEV. STATE BD. OF DENTAL EXAMINERS VS. LVI GLOBAL, LLC | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A651316 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/27/2012 / Levitt, Lansford | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/24/2012 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality. | ||
01/24/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and Request for Consideration by Single Justice due to Exceptional Time Constraints, Pursuant to NRAP 8(a)(2)(D). PART 1 (EMERGENCY). | 12-02503 | |
01/24/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and Request for Consideration by Single Justice due to Exceptional Time Constraints, Pursuant to NRAP 8(a)(2)(D). PART 2 (EMERGENCY). | 12-02504 | |
01/24/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 12-02523 | |
01/24/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | 12-02526 | |
01/25/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Stay. | 12-02745 | |
01/27/2012 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. | 12-02965 | |
02/06/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Kaempfer Crowell Renshaw Gronauer & Fiorentino on behalf of LVI Global, LLC). | 12-03926 | |
02/08/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. The premedation conference is continued until March 7, 2012. | 12-04305 | |
02/13/2012 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | 12-04760 | |
02/21/2012 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle R. Ferreyra-Marez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/12/11. | 12-05446 | |
03/09/2012 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. | 12-07773 | |
03/27/2012 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 90 days to file the opening brief. Court reporter Michelle R. Ferreyra-Marez filed a notice indicating that copies of the transcripts for proceedings conducted on December 12, 2011, had been prepared and delivered. Transcript request or certificate of no transcript request due: 15 days. | 12-09688 | |
04/04/2012 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant's Certificate Providing Notice That No Transcript is Being Requested, Pursuant to NRAP 9(a)(1)(C). | 12-10737 | |
06/20/2012 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Pursuant to NRAP 31(b)(2), To Extend Time to File and Serve Opening Brief and Appendix. | 12-19415 | |
06/20/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due July 25, 2012. | 12-19422 | |
07/25/2012 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | 12-23516 | |
07/25/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 1 (part 1). | 12-23517 | |
07/25/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 1 (part 2). | 12-23518 | |
07/25/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 2. | 12-23519 | |
08/06/2012 | Brief | Filed Nevada Legislature's Amicus Curiae Brief. | 12-24618 | |
08/15/2012 | Motion | Filed Stipulation, Pursuant to NRAP 31(b)(2), to Extend Time to File and Serve Respondent's Answering Brief and Appendix. | 12-25712 | |
08/15/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief and Appendix due September 24, 2012. | 12-25715 | |
09/25/2012 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | 12-30177 | |
10/30/2012 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. (DETACHED REPLY BRIEF AND FILED PER ORDER 12/6/12) | 12-34174 | |
12/06/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. The clerk of this court shall detach the reply brief from the October 30, 2012, motion for extension of time and file the reply brief. | 12-38423 | |
12/06/2012 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 12-38424 | |
12/06/2012 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | ||
12/14/2012 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order for Dismissal. | 12-39551 | |
12/24/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Having considered the stipulation to dismiss, we approve it and dismiss this appeal. The parties to bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. MC | 12-40638 |