judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: WRITTEN HANDOUT TO INFORM CRIMINAL DEFENDANTS OF THEIR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS

Administrative Case: ADKT 0265
Short Caption:IN RE: WRITTEN HANDOUT TO INFORM CRIMINAL DEFENDANTS OF THEIR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTSCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Case Closed
Filed Date:11/06/1997Public Hearing:
Closed Date:03/03/2001

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/06/1997Administrative CaseFiled Petition. 97-00030
11/19/1997Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
12/08/1997Administrative CaseFiled Order appointing a committee. Hon. Michael Douglas, District Judge, Chair; Hon. Douglas Smith, Hon. John Kadlic, and David Wasick. 97-00031
06/29/1998Administrative CaseFiled Report of the Committee on ADKT 265. 98-00655
07/17/1998Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
03/03/2001Administrative CaseIssued Memorandum. No further action being necessary herein, this matter is administratively closed this day. 01-22001
03/03/2001Administrative CaseCase Closed.