judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3801
B-3801
01/11/1973
MISC PETITION
JOHN PARKER, ET AL.
HON. EDWARD B. NOBLES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/30/1973Appellees' Brief filed
03/05/1973Appellant's Brief filed
01/18/1973Letter brief
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/13/1973Opinion issued
03/30/1973Appellees' Brief filed
03/05/1973Appellant's Brief filed
02/20/1973Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedFiling granted
02/08/1973Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedFiling granted
01/18/1973Letter brief
01/11/1973Document received (See Remarks)
01/11/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. Edward B. Nobles, et al.Appellee
John Parker, et al.Appellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information