judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HADDOX (DANIEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38246
Short Caption:HADDOX (DANIEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR5473Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/27/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/27/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-12744
08/10/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: No Dates Provided. Court Reporter: Tonya Lemich. 01-13618
08/13/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: May 2 - 4, 2001. Court Reporter: Tonja Lemich. Filed in district court on: August 10, 2001. (Filed by Clark County District Attorney.) 01-13749
08/28/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: May 2 - 4, 2001. Court Reporter: Tonja D. Lemich. 01-14576
09/10/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-15242
09/10/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-15243
09/28/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: October 8, 2001. 01-16403
10/08/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request) 01-16836
10/08/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed on October 8, 2001. Respondent's fast track response shall be served and filed on or before October 15, 2001. 01-16866
10/16/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-17479
12/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We decline to consider appellant's argument on the merits, and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-20432
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20585
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2002. 01-20585