judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES KOLAR v. R & P, INC.

Case Heading (S-08-0116)
Case Number:S-08-0116Case Docketed On:06/02/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:JAMES KOLAR v. R & P, INC.
Full Title:JAMES KOLAR, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. R & P, INC., Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames KolarRichard J. Mulligan
Heather Noble
AppelleeR & P, Inc.Stefan J. Fodor

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Employment Law
Opinion Number:2009 WY 56
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/02/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/02/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/16/2008Brief - Appellant and received copy of designation of record on appeal (service copy file stamped with wrong date--called counsel and advised)BriefAppellantFinal
07/25/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/28/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2008Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from Mr. Fodor indicating that he will be unavailable for oral argument during the October dates.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
08/13/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/22/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts & exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/22/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stefan Fodor for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Heather Noble for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/20/2008Order - Other - emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument, Justice Kite unavailableOrderOtherFinal
10/20/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke (Heather Noble for appellant; Stefan J. Fodor for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/21/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/07/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/13/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/11/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal